MO SB766 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the State Auditor to audit the University of Missouri System at least once annually
Title
Requires the State Auditor to audit the University of Missouri System at least once annually
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 766-Schmitt |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22259794 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB766.pdf |