MO SB766 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies portions of the Uniform Commercial Code relating to secured transactions
Title
Modifies portions of the Uniform Commercial Code relating to secured transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent |
2014-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent |
2014-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred H Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-13 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 766-Keaveny |