MO SB76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop and public school districts to adopt policies providing for accommodations for nursing mothers
Title
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop and public school districts to adopt policies providing for accommodations for nursing mothers
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |