MO SB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 76-Sater, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 76-Sater, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain MO HealthNet participants to comply with work and community engagement requirements
Title
Requires certain MO HealthNet participants to comply with work and community engagement requirements
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 76-Sater, with SCS (pending) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(0374S03.06S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Sater)--(0374S.03F) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (0374S.02C) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing to be Continued S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 76-Sater |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |