MO SB759 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (5616S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (5616S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (5616S.04C) | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-02-09 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | S First Read--SB 759-Lager |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1372712 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB759.pdf |