MO SB757 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - In Conference--SB 757-Schatz, with HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - In Conference--SB 757-Schatz, with HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the addition of Franklin County to the interstate compact creating the Bi-State Metropolitan Development District
Title
Authorizes the addition of Franklin County to the interstate compact creating the Bi-State Metropolitan Development District
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] | Rep. Nate Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 757 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 757 (HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 757 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 757 (HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 757 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | In Conference--SB 757-Schatz, with HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9 |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Tate, Eggleston, Reiboldt, Adams, Franks, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-17 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 9 H offered & adopted (Franks Jr.)--(4675S01.27H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 7 H withdrawn |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 7 H Vote Reconsidered |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 8 H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(4675S01.14H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Franks Jr.)--(4675S01.23H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Evans)--(4675S01.11H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(4675S01.03H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(4675S01.17H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(4675S01.04H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 2 H withdrawn |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill placed back on Formal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 2 H offered (Rhoads)--(4675S01.16H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Tate)--(4675S01.05H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2018-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 757-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |