MO SB755 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (3973S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts information pertaining to the salaries and benefits of certain members of the Board of the Public School Retirement System (PSRS) from confidentiality

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts information pertaining to the salaries and benefits of certain members of the Board of the Public School Retirement System (PSRS) from confidentiality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (3973S.03C)
2020-03-04SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2020-02-26SenateHearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee
2020-02-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 755-Sater
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback