MO SB754 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to cemeteries, the licensing of certain professions, death certificates, public assistance programs, and various other provisions
Title
Modifies provisions related to cemeteries, the licensing of certain professions, death certificates, public assistance programs, and various other provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-14 | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-14 | CCR#2 H adopted | |
2010-05-14 | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-14 | S offered & adopted CCR#2 | |
2010-05-13 | H submitted CCR#2/CCS#2 | |
2010-05-13 | H conferees appointed: Day, Wells, Wasson, Dougherty, Webb | |
2010-05-13 | S conferees appointed: Dempsey, Scott, Pearce, Justus, Callahan | |
2010-05-13 | H grants further conference | |
2010-05-13 | S requests H grant further conference | |
2010-05-13 | S refused to adopt CCR | |
2010-05-12 | Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn | |
2010-05-12 | CCR S offered | |
2010-05-06 | H conferees appointed: Day, Wells, Wasson, Dougherty, Webb | |
2010-05-05 | S conferees appointed: Dempsey, Scott, Pearce, Justus, Callahan | |
2010-05-05 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2010-05-04 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2010-05-04 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-04 | HSA 1 for HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pratt)--(3900L07.06L) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 10 to HCS H offered (Talboy)--(3900L07.19H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 9 to HCS H offered & defeated (Kirkton)--(3900L07.01L) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Guernsey)--(3900L07.23H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dixon)--(3900L07.05L) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wells)--(3900L07.07H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 5 to HCS H adopted | |
2010-05-04 | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(3900L07.10H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Franz)--(3900L07.09H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 4 to HCS H adopted | |
2010-05-04 | HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Newman)--(3900L07.25H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Emery)--(3900L07.21H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dougherty)--(3900L07.20H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Storch)--(3900L.0) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bivins)--(3900L07.01H) | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-04-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules-Pursuant Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2010-04-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2010-03-15 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-04 | H First Read | |
2010-03-04 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-01 | Perfected | |
2010-03-01 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-03-01 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Shoemyer)--(3900S05.01S) | |
2010-02-22 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-02-10 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (3900S.05C) | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-12 | S First Read--SB 754-Dempsey |