MO SB749 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies to provide coverage for hearing instruments and related services for enrollees under the age of 18
Title
Requires health insurance policies to provide coverage for hearing instruments and related services for enrollees under the age of 18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 749-White |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838167 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB749.pdf |