MO SB74 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to hate crimes against law enforcement officers and first responders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to hate crimes against law enforcement officers and first responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
2021-03-04SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2021-03-02SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1031S.02C)
2021-02-23SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-02-16SenateHearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback