MO SB74 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred H Insurance Policy
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Order Perfected (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseReferred H Insurance Policy
2017-03-06HouseH Second Read
2017-03-02HouseH First Read
2017-03-02SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-03-02SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-02-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-02-27SenateHearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-02-23SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2017-02-23SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-02-22SenatePerfected
2017-02-22SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2017-02-22SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0207S03.05S)
2017-02-22SenateSSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(0207S03.07S)
2017-02-22SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Munzlinger)--(0207S03.03S)
2017-02-22SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0207S03.04S)
2017-02-22SenateSS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(0207S.03F)
2017-01-26SenateReported from S Health and Pensions Committee, with SCS
2017-01-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0207S.02C)
2017-01-25SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 74-Schaaf
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback