MO SB74 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to tax increment financing and museum districts in natural disaster areas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to tax increment financing and museum districts in natural disaster areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2013-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2013-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 74-Richard
2012-12-13SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback