MO SB735 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Duty to inform campground guests of campground policies and establishes causes for which a campground owner can remove a person from a campground and a penalty for failure to leave

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Duty to inform campground guests of campground policies and establishes causes for which a campground owner can remove a person from a campground and a penalty for failure to leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-01HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-17HouseHearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-02HouseReferred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-03-10HouseH Second Read
2014-03-06HouseH First Read
2014-03-06SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-27SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-02-27SenatePerfected
2014-02-27SenateSCS S adopted
2014-02-26SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-26SenateTaken up for Perfection
2014-02-25SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-20SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-02-19SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5474S.03C)
2014-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2014-02-06SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2014-01-16SenateS First Read--SB 735-Brown

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback