MO SB734 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4109S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4109S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to funding for charter schools
Title
Modifies provisions related to funding for charter schools
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4109S.02C) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 734-Emery |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |