MO SB734 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the motor fuel tax from $0.17/gallon to $0.27/gallon
Title
Increases the motor fuel tax from $0.17/gallon to $0.27/gallon
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Schatz, with SCS |
2018-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (4963S.05C) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2018-04-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (4963S.03C) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 734-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |