MO SB734 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows sheriffs and deputies to assist in other counties throughout the state
Title
Allows sheriffs and deputies to assist in other counties throughout the state
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 734-Dixon |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 734-Dixon |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246626 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB734.pdf |