MO SB73 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes sales tax exemptions for certain purchases
Title
Authorizes sales tax exemptions for certain purchases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(0438S03.07S) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0438S03.02S) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Trent)--(0438S.03F) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee w/SCS |
2023-02-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S (w/SCSs SB 73 & 162) Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee (0438S.02C) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |