MO SB729 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Private College Campus Protection Act" which allows the College of the Ozarks to employ campus police officers
Title
Establishes the "Private College Campus Protection Act" which allows the College of the Ozarks to employ campus police officers
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 729-Sater |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838142 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB729.pdf |