MO SB724 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain selective abortions relating to sex, race, or Down Syndrome

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain selective abortions relating to sex, race, or Down Syndrome

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-01-24SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 724-Sater
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback