MO SB722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to conduct a study regarding the importation of certain prescription drugs by the state
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to conduct a study regarding the importation of certain prescription drugs by the state
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 722-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |