MO SB719 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the laws relating to school purchases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the laws relating to school purchases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-07SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-07HouseS Third Read and Passed, as amended
2014-05-07HouseS concurs in HA 2
2014-05-07HouseS concurs in HA 1
2014-05-05HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2014-05-05HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(5270S01.02L)
2014-05-05HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Wood)--(5270S01.03H)
2014-04-29HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-29HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
2014-04-28HouseVoted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
2014-04-14HouseHearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
2014-04-02HouseReferred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
2014-03-31HouseH Second Read
2014-03-27HouseH First Read
2014-03-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-03-26SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-03-26SenatePerfected
2014-03-13SenateReported from S Education Committee to Floor
2014-03-06SenateRemoved S Consent Calendar
2014-02-27SenateReported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent
2014-02-19SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted
2014-02-19SenateVoted Do Pass S Education Committee
2014-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2014-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2014-01-14SenateS First Read--SB 719-Kehoe

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback