MO SB711 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires thirty minutes of cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction and training during high school
Title
Requires thirty minutes of cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction and training during high school
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Ronald Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 711 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-10 | House | HCS H defeated |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 711-Brown |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |