MO SB710 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS#3 for SCS for SB 710-Engler
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and modifies other provisions relating to controlled substances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and modifies other provisions relating to controlled substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-18 S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS#3 for SCS for SB 710-Engler
2012-05-07 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2012-05-03 Perfected
2012-05-03 SS#3 for SCS S offered & adopted (Engler)--(4886S.10F)
2012-05-03 SS#2 for SCS S withdrawn
2012-03-28 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-03-28 SS#2 for SCS S offered (Engler)--(4886S.08F)
2012-03-28 SS for SCS S withdrawn
2012-03-20 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-03-20 Taken up for perfection
2012-03-05 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-03-05 SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(4886S06.01S)
2012-03-05 SS for SCS S offered (Engler)--(4886S.06F)
2012-02-29 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-02-23 Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
2012-02-20 SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (4886S.05C)
2012-02-13 Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2012-02-02 Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2012-01-26 S First Read--SB 710-Engler, et al

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback