MO SB700 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to workers' compensation premium rates
Title
Modifies the law relating to workers' compensation premium rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 700 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 700 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 700 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 700 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 700 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H Third Read and Passed CCS |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-06 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(4619S.02S) |
2016-05-06 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(4619S02.1SR) |
2016-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-04 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-02 | House | S conferees appointed: Schatz, Parson, Libla, Curls, Walsh |
2016-05-02 | House | H conferees appointed: Dohrman, Ross, Davis, Webber, Carpenter |
2016-05-02 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-04-28 | House | S refuses to concur in SB 700-Schatz, with HA 1, as amended & HA 2 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-04-26 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(4619S01.04H) |
2016-04-26 | House | HA 1, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(4619S01.09H) |
2016-04-26 | House | HA 1 H offered (Ross)--(4619S01.08H) |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 700-Schatz |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |