MO SB70 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning January 1, 2018
Title
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning January 1, 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 70-Schupp |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095287 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB70.pdf |