MO SB7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of civil procedure regarding joinder and venue

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of civil procedure regarding joinder and venue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 7 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 7 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 7 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 7 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 7 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSigned by Governor
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-01HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-01HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-01HousePart II H adopted
2019-05-01HousePart I H adopted
2019-05-01HouseMotion to divide the question H adopted
2019-04-30HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-29HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-04-29HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-04-24HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-04-15HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-15HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-03-12HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2019-03-06HouseReferred H Judiciary
2019-03-06HouseH Second Read
2019-03-05HouseH First Read
2019-03-04SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-04SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-03-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-02-27SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-02-27SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-26SenatePerfected
2019-02-26SenateSS#2, as amended, S adopted
2019-02-26SenateSA 2 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0212S13.03S)
2019-02-26SenateSA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0212S13.01S)
2019-02-26SenateSS#2 S offered (Emery)--(0212S.13F)
2019-02-26SenateSS S withdrawn
2019-02-26SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Sifton)--(0212S04.10S)
2019-02-26SenateSS S offered (Emery)--(0212S.04F)
2019-02-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-07SenateReported from S Government Reform Committee
2019-02-05SenateVoted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 7-Emery
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback