MO SB699 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 699-Riddle, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts the inspection of grounds or facilities used for certain agricultural purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts the inspection of grounds or facilities used for certain agricultural purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 699-Riddle, with SCS
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2020-02-17SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (4007S.02C)
2020-02-10SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2020-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 699-Riddle
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback