MO SB698 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding estate administration and the office of public administrator and establishes the Designated Health Care Decision-Maker Act
Title
Modifies provisions regarding estate administration and the office of public administrator and establishes the Designated Health Care Decision-Maker Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2016-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCAs 1, 2 & 3 |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments |
2016-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS for SCS S adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Emery)--(4945S04.01S) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(4945S.04F) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (4945S.03C) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 698-Hegeman |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |