MO SB693 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | No motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (5185S05.1SR) |
2014-05-14 | House | H submits CCR#2 (5185S05.01F) |
2014-05-08 | House | S conferees appointed: Parson, Dixon, Romine, Keaveny, LeVota |
2014-05-08 | House | H conferees appointed: Jones-50, Elmer, LaFaver |
2014-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-07 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-07 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-07 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Butler)--(5185H02.43H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Miller)--(5185H02.55H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Flanigan)--(5185H02.22H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 12 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown)--(5185H02.58H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered (Barnes)--(5185H02.10H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rizzo)--(5185H02.03H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Scharnhorst)--(5185H02.33H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(5185H02.32H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(5185H02.39H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Muntzel)--(5185H02.26H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5185H02.56H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (White)--(5185H02.48H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Crawford)--(5185H02.08H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(5185H02.42H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(5185H02.02H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(5185H02.54H) |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2014-03-25 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Sater)--(5185S01.01S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 693-Parson |