MO SB690 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: SB 690 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | In Conference |
2022-05-11 | House | Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn (Thompson Rehder)--(3344S10.1SR) |
2022-05-11 | House | Substitute Motion#2: S grant further conference & the conferees be allowed to exceed the difference by adding sections 208.152 & 208.153. (Onder) |
2022-05-11 | House | Motion to lay substitute motion on table adopted (White) |
2022-05-11 | House | Substitute Motion#1: S grant further conference & the conferees be allowed to exceed the difference by adding sections 208.152 & 208.153. (Onder) |
2022-05-11 | House | CCR taken up for adoption (Thompson Rehder) |
2022-05-11 | House | Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn (Thompson Rehder)--(3344S10.1SR) |
2022-05-11 | House | CCR S offered --(3344S10.1SR) (Thompson Rehder) |
2022-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Thompson Rehder, White, Hough, Arthur, Razer |
2022-05-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Christofanelli, Eggleston, Black(7), Sharp(36), Proudie |
2022-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2022-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2022-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(3344H09.16H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory-51)--(3344H09.33H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Coleman-32)--(3344H09.32H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Kelley-127)--(3344H09.16H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3344H09.13H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cook)--(3344H09.34H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Deaton)--(3344H09.13H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3344H09.17H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Andrews)--(3344H09.29H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (DeGroot)--(3344H09.26H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Seitz)--(3344H09.22H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Black-7)--(3344H09.17H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(3344H09.12H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Buchheit-Courtway)--(3344H09.04H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H defeated |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (DeGroot)--(3344H09.25H) |
2022-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Christofanelli)--(3344H09.19H) |
2022-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2022-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session - H Emerging Issues - Action postponed |
2022-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2022-04-11 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-07 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-04-04 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Thompson Rehder)--(3344S.03F) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |