MO SB681 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 33 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 (HA 19) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: SB 681 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 (HA 19) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: SB 681 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2022-05-12 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR#2--(4133S14.1SR) |
2022-05-10 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-10 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin) |
2022-05-09 | House | H distributes CCR#2/CCS#2--(4133S.14S) |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate conferees: O'Laughlin, Koenig, Eslinger, Arthur, Schupp |
2022-05-06 | House | House conferees: Basye, Francis, Haffner, Sharp(36), Proudie |
2022-05-06 | House | Motion to allow H conferees to exceed the differences on section 160.077 H adopted |
2022-05-06 | House | H grants further conference |
2022-05-06 | House | Motion to allow S conferees to exceed the differences on section 160.077 S adopted |
2022-05-06 | House | S requests H grant further conference |
2022-05-06 | House | H distributes CCR |
2022-05-05 | House | Motion to allow H conferees to exceed the differences on section 160.077 H adopted |
2022-05-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Basye, Francis, Haffner, Sharp(36), Proudie |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate conferees appointed: O'Laughlin, Koenig, Eslinger, Arthur, Schupp |
2022-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2022-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2022-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 19 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-141)--(4133H10.41H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(4133H10.24H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sharp-36)--(4133H10.05H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.31H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Butz)--(4133H10.27H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.39H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-16)--(4133H10.04H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (West)--(4133H10.26H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 11 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.17H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schwadron)--(4133H10.48H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered (Hurlbert)--(4133H10.17H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(4133H10.21H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-7)--(4133H10.07H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reedy)--(4133H10.36H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(4133H10.09H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.30H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rogers)--(4133H10.46H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Dinkins)--(4133H10.30H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.19H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lewis-6)--(4133H10.57H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(4133H10.45H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Richey)--(4133H10.19H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hudson)--(4133H10.47H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Haffner)--(4133H10.29H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4133H10.38H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(4133H10.56H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt-52)--(4133H10.50H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Basye)--(4133H10.38H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory-51)--(4133H10.14H) |
2022-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(4133H10.37H) |
2022-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2022-04-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2022-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2022-03-21 | House | H Second Read |
2022-03-10 | House | H First Read |
2022-03-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)--(4133S08.01S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(4133S08.12S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (O'Laughlin & Arthur)--(4133S.08F) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2022-02-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 681 & 662) Education Committee (4133S.06C) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |