MO SB680 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to public assistance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to public assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-20SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-15SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-15HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2014-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-15HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McManus)--(4890H03.12H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wieland)--(4890H03.09H)
2014-05-15HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-06HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2014-05-05HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2014-05-05HouseHearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2014-04-29HouseReferred H Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2014-04-03HouseH Second Read
2014-04-02HouseH First Read
2014-04-02SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-01SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-04-01SenatePerfected
2014-04-01SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-04-01SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(4890S02.01S)
2014-03-13SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-03-05SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (4890S.02C)
2014-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 680-Curls

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback