MO SB672 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Supporting and Strengthening Families Act relating to guardianships using a power of attorney and modifies provisions regarding no-contest clauses in trust instruments
Title
Establishes the Supporting and Strengthening Families Act relating to guardianships using a power of attorney and modifies provisions regarding no-contest clauses in trust instruments
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Koenig [R] | Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4224S.07C) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 672-Koenig |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |