MO SB672 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to businesses, political subdivisions, fire sprinklers, garnishments, asphalt shingles, and real estate appraisers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to businesses, political subdivisions, fire sprinklers, garnishments, asphalt shingles, and real estate appraisers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16HouseCCS#2 H Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16HouseCCR#2 H adopted
2014-05-13SenateCCS#2 S Third Read and Passed
2014-05-13SenateCCR#2 S offered & adopted (5090S08.1SR)
2014-05-13SenateH submits CCR#2 (5090S08.1SR)
2014-05-13SenateH conferees appointed: Jones-50, Elmer, LaFaver
2014-05-12SenateS conferees appointed: Parson, Dixon, Romine, Justus, Keaveny
2014-05-12SenateS grants further conference
2014-05-12SenateH requests further conference
2014-05-12SenateH refuses to adopt CCR
2014-05-08SenateH submits CCR (5090S06.01F)
2014-05-08HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2014-05-08HouseCCR S offered & adopted (5090S06.1SR)
2014-05-06HouseH conferees appointed: Jones-50, Elmer, LaFaver
2014-05-06HouseS conferees appointed: Parson, Dixon, Romine, Justus, Keaveny
2014-05-06HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2014-05-01HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2014-05-01HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2014-04-30HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-30HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-04-30HouseHA 17 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-04-30HouseHA 1 to HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(5090H04.69H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 17 to HCS H offered (Hicks)--(5090H04.18H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(5090H04.74H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5090H04.20H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(5090H04.57H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lair)--(5090H04.29H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Montecillo) (5090H04.39H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(5090H04.55H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hicks)--(5090H04.37H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Remole)--(5090H04.13H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(5090H04.01H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(5090H04.40H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(5090H04.50H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Scharnhorst)--(5090H04.10H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(5090H04.04L)
2014-04-30HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(5090H04.72H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5090H04.36H)
2014-04-30HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(5090H04.07H)
2014-04-30HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-04-22HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-04-01HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2014-03-26HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2014-03-20HouseH Second Read
2014-03-13HouseH First Read
2014-03-13SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-03-11SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-03-10SenatePerfected
2014-03-10SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-03-10SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(5090S02.01S)
2014-03-06SenateReported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-03-05SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5090S.02C)
2014-02-05SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2014-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 672-Parson

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback