MO SB67 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 67-Onder, et al, with SS, SA 1 & SSA 1 for SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to abortion, including donation of fetal tissue, tissue reports, abortion reports, employee disclosure policies, and abortion facility inspections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to abortion, including donation of fetal tissue, tissue reports, abortion reports, employee disclosure policies, and abortion facility inspections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 67-Onder, et al, with SS, SA 1 & SSA 1 for SA 1 (pending)
2017-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-04-04SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered (Sifton)--(0588S05.08S)
2017-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-04-04SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Hoskins)--(0588S05.01S)
2017-04-04SenateSS S offered (Onder)--(0588S.05F)
2017-03-29SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-18SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 67-Onder, et al
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback