MO SB669 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum duration of credit transaction that is subject to regulation under the statutes governing credit insurance
Title
Increases the maximum duration of credit transaction that is subject to regulation under the statutes governing credit insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2020-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2020-03-15 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 669-Hough |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |