MO SB664 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to natural resources

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to natural resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-07SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCR H adopted
2014-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (5127S06.1SR)
2014-05-15HouseH submits CCR
2014-05-15HouseS conferees appointed: Brown, Romine, Sater, Sifton, Justus
2014-05-15HouseH conferees appointed: Miller, Phillips, Anders
2014-05-15HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2014-05-15HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2014-05-15HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2014-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
2014-05-15HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-15HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Miller)--(5127H05.03H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Ross)--(5127H05.11H)
2014-05-15HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-07HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-03HouseHearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-03-26HouseReferred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-03-03HouseH Second Read
2014-02-27HouseH First Read
2014-02-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-27SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2014-02-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-24SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-20SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-02-20SenatePerfected
2014-02-20SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-02-18SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-18SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(5127S03.01S)
2014-02-17SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-13SenateReported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-02-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5127S.03C)
2014-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2014-01-23SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 664-Brown
2014-01-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback