MO SB662 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 662-Bernskoetter, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various provisions relating to judicial proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various provisions relating to judicial proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 662 (HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 662 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 662 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 662 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseS Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 662-Bernskoetter, with HCS, as amended
2020-05-05HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
2020-05-05HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2020-05-05HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(3931H05.11H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt)--(3931H05.22H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley)--(3931H05.07H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(3931H05.12H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 6, as amended, to HCS H adopted--(3931H05.26H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(3931H05.32H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (Roberts)--(3931H05.26H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(3931H05.25H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(3931H05.19H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3931H05.04H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Billington)--(3931H05.03H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Evans)--(3931H05.10H)
2020-05-04HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-01HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-04-30HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-04-30HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-29HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-29HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-04-28HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-04-27HouseReferred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-02-24HouseH Second Read
2020-02-20HouseH First Read
2020-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-02-19SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-18SenatePerfected
2020-02-18SenateSCS S adopted
2020-02-03SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2020-02-03SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (3931S.03C)
2020-01-27SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2020-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 662-Bernskoetter
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838171
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB662.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB662.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/comm/SB662.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/perf/SB662.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0662.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay230220334-350.pdf#342
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.022.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.019.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback