MO SB66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0552S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0552S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to water safety and security
Title
Establishes provisions relating to water safety and security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0552S.03C) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 66-White |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=42 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB66.pdf |