MO SB659 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3952S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3952S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools
Title
Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3952S.02C) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |