MO SB654 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2022-03-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4383S.05C) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |