MO SB653 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 653 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 653 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: SB 653 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 653 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: SB 653 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | H distributes CCR |
2020-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(3423S06.1SR) |
2020-05-08 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Crawford, Sater, Riddle, Schupp, May |
2020-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Solon, Kelly-141, Coleman-97, Ingle, Aldridge |
2020-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2020-05-08 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2020-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-04 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(3423H05.09H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-01 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2020-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (3423S.03C) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 653-Crawford |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |