MO SB65 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts vessels propelled by outboard jet motors and vessels not originally manufactured with adequate guards or railing from the provisions prohibiting passengers from riding in certain areas of a boat

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts vessels propelled by outboard jet motors and vessels not originally manufactured with adequate guards or railing from the provisions prohibiting passengers from riding in certain areas of a boat

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 65 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-14HouseVetoed by Governor
2017-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker
2017-05-22HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2017-05-22HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2017-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2017-05-12HouseH Third Read and Passed
2017-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-03HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-03HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2017-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2017-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2017-04-19HouseReferred H General Laws
2017-03-13HouseH Second Read
2017-03-09HouseH First Read
2017-03-09SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-03-08SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-03-07SenatePerfected
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-19SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-12SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 65-Schatz
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback