MO SB65 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Equal Opportunity Scholarship Program to provide scholarships to students from unaccredited school districts for certain educational costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Equal Opportunity Scholarship Program to provide scholarships to students from unaccredited school districts for certain educational costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateHearing Cancelled S Education Committee
2015-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2015-01-07SenateS First Read--SB 65-Emery
2014-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback