MO SB649 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4106S09.02S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(4106S.09F) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Part II of SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Part I of SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(4106S04.17S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(4106S04.10S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(4106S.04F) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2022-01-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (4106S.03C) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |