MO SB649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the per ton fee that is paid to the Division of Fire Safety for the use of explosives under the Missouri Blasting Safety Act
Title
Modifies the per ton fee that is paid to the Division of Fire Safety for the use of explosives under the Missouri Blasting Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill placed back on Formal Calendar |
2018-05-02 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill Placed back on Formal Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken up for Third Reading (H) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 649-Romine |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |