MO SB646 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop training guidelines and school districts to adopt a policy for youth suicide awareness and prevention education
Title
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to develop training guidelines and school districts to adopt a policy for youth suicide awareness and prevention education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-03-31 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted (4309S.03C) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4309S.03C) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 646-Schupp |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |