MO SB644 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies law regarding service animals
Title
Modifies law regarding service animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 644 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 644 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 644 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | HCS H defeated |
2020-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2020-03-09 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-05 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(3552S.02F) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 644-Hoskins |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |