MO SB644 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 644-LeVota
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 644-LeVota
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the time period for fiscal notes to analyze on proposed legislation
Title
Modifies the time period for fiscal notes to analyze on proposed legislation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 644-LeVota |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 644-LeVota |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27827407 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB644.pdf |