MO SB643 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the publishing of the Missouri statutes by the Revisor of Statutes
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the publishing of the Missouri statutes by the Revisor of Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2014-04-30 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS H adopted |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee - Consent |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee - Consent |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-06 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-27 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(4989S02.F1) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(4989S02.02S) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee - Consent vote adopted (4989S.02C) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (4989S.02C) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 643-Rupp |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |